Wiss, Francois Rene (CPSO#: 17351)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Haiti, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 01 Jan 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jan 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2005