Witchell, Stephen James (CPSO#: 29971)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Bermuda

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 24 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018