Withers, Martin John (CPSO#: 58175)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 8 - 2600 Lakeshore Road
Brights Grove ON  N0N 1C0
Phone: (226) 254 0210
Fax: (226) 254 0212
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martin J. Withers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Withers ( CPSO# 58175 )

Business Address:
1150 Pontiac Drive
Unit 4
Sarnia ON  N7S 3A7
Phone Number: (519) 339-8949

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN JOHN WITHERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WITHERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1988