Witkowski, Amelia Anna (CPSO#: 101295)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2 Serpentine Street
Copper Cliff ON  P0M1N0
Phone: 7056820300
Fax: 7056820303
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amelia A. Witkowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Witkowski ( CPSO# 101295)

Business Address:
Suite C
960 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury ON  P3A 2T4
Phone Number: (705) 560-1018

Business Address:
1280 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 1Y8
Phone Number: (705) 522-3380

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Feb 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMELIA ANNA WITKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WITKOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2016