Witt-Sullivan, Helga Brigitte (CPSO#: 52420)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Nov 1984

Summary

Former Name: Witt, Helga Brigitte (used until: 25 May 1983 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
315 York Boulevard
Hamilton ON  L8R 3K5
Phone: (905) 528-2564
Fax: 905-527-4126
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Helga Witt-Sullivan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Witt-Sullivan ( CPSO# 52420 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
315 York Boulevard
Hamilton ON  L8R 3K5
Phone Number: (905) 528-2564

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HELGA BRIGITTE WITT-SULLIVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WITT-SULLIVAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1984