Witterick, Ian James (CPSO#: 57122)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 413
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 8313
Fax: (416) 586-8583
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ian Witterick Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Witterick ( CPSO# 57122 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
413 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
University Health Network
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
University of Toronto
Faculty of Medicine
1 Kings College Circle
Toronto ON  M5S 1A8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 04 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN JAMES WITTERICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WITTERICK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1988