Wlodarski, Martin Jozef (CPSO#: 95712)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: CDK Family Medicine & Walk-In Clinic 175 Princess Street Kingston ON K7L 1A9 OR Queen's Family Health Team 220 Bagot Street Kingston ON K7L 5E9
Instructions: Please contact Hospital or Clinic where patient was seen.
Date Received: 31 May 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jan 2013 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 16 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 17 Jan 2012 to 16 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016