Wlodek, George Kazimierz (CPSO#: 23300)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:Queen's University, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1961 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1956
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1957
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004