Woch, Mikel Zbigniew (CPSO#: 59000)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Sep 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993