Wohlgelernter, Joseph Isaiah Ozer (CPSO#: 23625)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
441 Clark Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6W8
Phone: (905) 882-8103
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joseph Wohlgelernter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wohlgelernter ( CPSO# 23625 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
441 Clark Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6W8
Phone Number: (905) 882-8103

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH ISAIAH OZER WOHLGELERNTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOHLGELERNTER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1970
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1971