Wojakowski, Krystyna Halina (CPSO#: 42186)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish, Russian

Education:Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Command Records Management 100 Piccadilly Street London ON N6A 1R8 Phone: 519-672-1460 Toll Free: 1-888-335-3379
Date Received: 16 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 21 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017