Wolff, Bryan Christopher (CPSO#: 61196)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Willowdale ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6001
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bryan Wolff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wolff ( CPSO# 61196 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6598

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRYAN CHRISTOPHER WOLFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLFF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1990