Wolff, Evelyn (CPSO#: 25660)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2012

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: December 4, 2012
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Evelyn Wolff to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”).

I, Dr. Evelyn Wolff:

1. Certificate of registration number 25660, was a member of the College between June 19, 1973 and August 8, 2012 (the “Resignation Date”). The College has received information regarding my standard of practice.

2. Acknowledge that I was the subject of an investigation (the “Investigation”) by the College regarding whether I have maintained the standard of practice of the profession (the “Investigation”).

3. Acknowledge that there has been no referral to the Discipline Committee of the College in respect of the Investigation and that the concerns arising in the Complaint were not proven before the Discipline Committee.

4. Acknowledge that I have voluntarily resigned my certificate of registration with the College.

5. Confirm that I am not registered as a physician and do not hold a license to practice medicine in any jurisdiction other than Ontario, nor do I have any outstanding applications for such registration or licensure.

6. Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the date of this undertaking (the “Effective Date”).