Wolff, Gerald Keith (CPSO#: 80824)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
Dept of Physical Medicine & Rehab
Room 1105
505 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 75598
Fax: (613) 739-6974
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University of Ottawa
Sports Medicine Clinic
Suite N203
801 King Edward Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Canada
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Fax: (613) 564-6627
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Ottawa Civic Hopsital
Electrodiagnostics Lab
1053 Carling Ave,
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-4324
Fax: (613) 761-5333
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Wolff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Wolff ( CPSO# 80824 )

Business Address:
The Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
Dept of Physical Medicine & Rehab
Room 1105
505 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 564-3950

Business Address:
801 King Edward Avenue
Room N203
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone Number: (613) 564-3950

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERALD KEITH WOLFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLFF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009