Wolfish, Karen Reva (CPSO#: 62475)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1991


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1919 Riverside Drive
Suite 311
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone: (613) 526-0080
Fax: (613) 526-9749
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

80 Michael Cowpland Dr.
Kanata ON  K2M 1W8
Phone: (613) 599-3321
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

100 Marie Curie
suite 200
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Phone: (613) 564-3950
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wolfish Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2008

Dr. S. Aaron ( CPSO# 62311 )
Dr. K. Wolfish ( CPSO# 62475 )
Dr. N. Wolfish ( CPSO# 18469 )

Business Address:
Ottawa General Hospital
1812F - 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 739-6636

Business Address:
Suite 311
1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 526-0080

Business Address:
7th Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9

Business Address:
Health Services
University of Ottawa
Suite 200
100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 1A2

Business Address:
80 Michael Cowpland
Kanata ON  K2M 2G9
Phone Number: (613) 599-3321

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa


Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. KAREN REVA WOLFISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLFISH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1991