Wolfrom, Brent David (CPSO#: 80930)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
115 Clarence Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5N6
Phone: (613) 533-9303
Fax: 613 533-9308
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brent D. Wolfrom Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wolfrom ( CPSO# 80930 )

Business Address:
115 Clarence Street
Kingston ON  K7L 0A3
Phone Number: (613) 533-9303

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENT DAVID WOLFROM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLFROM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2006