Wolfs, Maria Elena (CPSO#: 73395)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: Kraw, Maria Elena (used until: 14 Sep 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Health Centre
6113
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-3711
Fax: (416) 867-3724
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 15 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA ELENA WOLFS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLFS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2003