Wollach, Barry Alan (CPSO#: 59165)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 1997