Wolman, Stephen Laurie (CPSO#: 27356)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
9N979
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3507
Fax: (416) 340-4785
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen L. Wolman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wolman ( CPSO# 27356 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital North Wing
Room 979
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3507

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 27 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN LAURIE WOLMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1975