Wong, Albert Gee-Meng (CPSO#: 59954)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2000 Credit Valley Road
Suite 402
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 828-1077
Fax: (905) 828-9443
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Albert G. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wong ( CPSO# 59954 )

Business Address:
Suite 402
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 828-1077

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective: 03 Dec 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALBERT GEE-MENG WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 03 Aug 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1989