Wong, Alexander Chung Hun (CPSO#: 85920)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Feb 2007 to 09 Mar 2007
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Sep 2009 to 11 Oct 2009
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 05 Apr 2010 to 02 May 2010
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2012