Wong, Amy Hong (CPSO#: 81998)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:New York College of Osteopathic Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 18
16945 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 9A2
Phone: (905) 868-8689
Fax: (905) 868-9479
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.H. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 05 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wong ( CPSO# 81998 )

Business Address:
Suite 18
16945 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 9A2
Phone Number: (905) 868-8689

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMY HONG WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2004 to 17 Nov 2004
Elective Trainee - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Nov 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Mar 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2007