Wong, Andrew Chi Yan (CPSO#: 61145)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
240 Alton Towers Circle
Suite 303
Scarborough ON  M1V 3Z3
Phone: (416) 321-1232
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW CHI YAN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1990