Wong, Angela Mi Yin (CPSO#: 62082)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9640 Bayview Avenue
Suite 2
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9P7
Phone: (905) 737-0509
Fax: (905) 737-4889
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angela Mi Yin Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wong ( CPSO# 62082 )

Business Address:
9640 Bayview Avenue
Suite 2
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9P7
Phone Number: (905) 737-0509

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA MI YIN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1991