Wong, Angela (CPSO#: 69873)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 135
Unit C216
777 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C8
Phone: (416) 977-8878
Fax: (416) 977-0118
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

South Riverdale C H C
955 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 3P3
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-2493
Fax: (416) 461-8245
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Angela Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wong ( CPSO# 69873 )

Business Address:
P. O. Box 135
Unit C216
777 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C8
Phone Number: (416) 977-8878

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1998