Wong, Bill Tai-Pang (CPSO#: 23560)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Fukien, Mandarin, Taiwanese

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2001
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2001
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 28 Dec 2001
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 03 Apr 2002
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 29 Oct 2001
Summary:

 On October 29, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Wong(s plea of guilty and found him 
 guilty of professional misconduct with regard to disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional 
 conduct.  The Committee ordered the following:

      1.	      Dr. Wong be reprimanded and the 
 fact of the reprimand be recorded on the register;

2.	the Interim Registrar will suspend Dr. 
 Wong(s certificate of registration for a period of six months, three months of which will be 
 suspended if Dr. Wong successfully completes the College(s next available boundaries course.  Such 
 suspension shall commence on a date to be set by the Registrar of the College, which date shall be 
 no earlier than December 1, 2001 and no later than January 1, 2002;

3.	Effective immediately, Dr. 
 Wong will not conduct any physical examination of a female patient except in the presence of a 
 third party who is at least 21 years of age, who is acceptable to the Registrar;

4.	Effective 
 immediately, Dr. Wong will display a sign acceptable to the Registrar, in his office advising 
 patients that a third party must be present during an examination of a female patient;

5.	Dr. 
 Wong will agree to a re-examination of his practice by the College for the purpose of ensuring 
 that these conditions are being met, on a date or dates set by the Registrar within one year of 
 Dr. Wong(s return to practice from his suspension;

6.	Dr. Wong will pay costs to the College in 
 the amount of $2,500.00 by December 31, 2001; and 

7.	Dr. Wong will post security acceptable to 
 the College in the amount of $30,000.00 to guarantee the payment of any amounts the College may 
 pay out in respect of the complainants for funding for therapy and counselling pursuant to section 
 85.7 of the Health Professions Procedural Code.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 30 Jul 2001

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: December 28, 2005
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On January 23, 2006, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario withdrew allegations of
professional misconduct against Dr. Wong in exchange for the following undertaking from him:

1. I, DR. BILL TAI-PANG WONG, have resigned from the College of Physicians and
Surgeons of Ontario (the “CPSO”) as of May 18, 2005.

2. I, DR. BILL TAI-PANG WONG, hereby undertake not to apply for registration as a
physician or for a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction.

3. I, DR. BILL TAI-PANG WONG, acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the
CPSO agrees to withdraw the allegations of professional misconduct that are currently
pending before the Discipline Committee, which are contained in the Notice of Hearing dated
November 25, 2004 and which are as follows:
• Dr. Wong contravened a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration;
• Dr. Wong failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession;
• Dr. Wong committed an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that,
having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as
disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional; and
• Dr. Wong sexually abused a patient.

4. I, DR. BILL TAI-PANG WONG, acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the
CPSO will take no further action in respect of any other matters relating to Dr. Wong that are
currently under investigation or that may come to the CPSO’s attention in the future.

5. I, DR. BILL TAI-PANG WONG, acknowledge and understand that should the CPSO
become aware that I have applied for registration as a physician or for a licence to practice
medicine in any jurisdiction, the CPSO shall, in its full discretion, have the right to proceed
with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful,
shall have the right to do the following:
• Proceed with a disciplinary hearing pertaining to the allegations contained in the
Notice of Hearing dated November 25, 2004;
• Resume its investigation of the matters currently under investigation pertaining to Dr.
Wong; and
• Pursue any action it deems appropriate pertaining to matters that may come to the
CPSO’s attention.

6. I, DR. BILL TAI-PANG WONG, undertake within 15 days of my signing this undertaking
to:
a. provide to the CPSO a letter of credit in the amount of $10,000.00, which will continue
for 5 years from the date this undertaking is signed;
b. to continue his letter of credit to the CPSO (Letter of Credit #0153-9780000-01 dated
January 3, 2002) for 5 years from the date this undertaking is signed.

7. I, DR. BILL TAI-PANG WONG, do not, by entering into this undertaking, admit the truth of
any of the allegations contained in the Notice of Hearing dated November 25, 2004 or under
investigation by the CPSO as of the date of this undertaking.