Wong, Bobby Chun Ho (CPSO#: 65489)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
PostGrad Yr 1 - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 2015