Wong, David Kah Heng (CPSO#: 59609)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
EN9-228
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3279
Fax: (416) 340-3644
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Michaels Hospital
Positive Care Clinic
4th Floor CC North
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: (416) 864-5696
Fax: (416) 864-5310
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID KAH HENG WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 30 Oct 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1999