Wong, David Tai Wai (CPSO#: 52120)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5118
Fax: (416) 603-6494
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Tai Wai Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wong ( CPSO# 52120 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
MC2-405
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5118

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 21 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID TAI WAI WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 14 Jun 1982
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1988