Wong, David Tak Wah (CPSO#: 60837)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 801
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-3670
Fax: (416) 867-3687
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1260 Lawrenece Ave. E.
Toronto ON  M3A 1C4
Canada
Phone: (416) 867-3670
Fax: (416) 867-3687
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: (416) 867-3670
Fax: (416) 867-3687
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

340 College St.
#600
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: 416-928-2132
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2065 Finch Ave W
Suite 400
North York ON  M3N 2V7
Canada
Phone: 416-748-2020
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wong ( CPSO# 60837 )

Business Address:
400 - 2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 748-2020

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000

Business Address:
801 - 61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3670

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
1260 Lawrence Avenue East
North York ON  M3A 1C4
Phone Number: (416) 867-3670

Business Address:
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 11 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID TAK WAH WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1990