Wong, Delora (CPSO#: 66745)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1995


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 428
2065 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3N 2V7
Phone: (416) 745-3574
Fax: (416) 745-9702
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cummer Lodge
205 Cummer Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 2E8
Phone: (416) 392-9500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Delora Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2006

Dr. D. Wong ( CPSO# 66745 )

Business Address:
428 - 2065 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 745-3574


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. DELORA WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1995