Wong, Dennis Kachun (CPSO#: 106890)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
214-6633 Highway 7
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone: (905) 294-2290
Fax: (905) 294-0029
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P7P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7000
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dennis K. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wong ( CPSO# 106890)

Business Address:
Suite 214
6633 Highway #7
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone Number: (905) 294-2290

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENNIS KACHUN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2017