Wong, Diane Catherine (CPSO#: 74457)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4th Floor
129 Yorkville Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 1C4
Phone: (416) 920-9998
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

15435 Yonge St.
Aurora ON  L4G 1P3
Canada
Phone: 905-726-9333
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hilton Toronto/Markham Suites
8500 Warden Ave.
Markham ON  L6G 1A5
Canada
Phone: 905-470-8522
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Diane C. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wong ( CPSO# 74457 )

Business Address:
129 Yorkville Avenue
4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5R 1C4
Phone Number: (416) 920-9998

Business Address:
8500 Warden Avenue
Markham ON  L6G 1A5
Phone Number: (905) 470-8522

Business Address:
15435 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1P3
Phone Number: (905) 726-9333

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANE CATHERINE WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2000 to 30 Apr 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2001