Wong, Edward Yu Chi (CPSO#: 19837)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward Y.C. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 31 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 20 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017