Wong, Florence Suet Hing (CPSO#: 66157)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jan 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Melbourne, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
9EB 222
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3834
Fax: (416) 340-5019
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: (416) 864-6060
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Florence Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Wong ( CPSO# 66157 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
9EN222 - 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3834

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 01 Oct 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FLORENCE SUET HING WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1996