Wong, Gene (CPSO#: 57823)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 May 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 14 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 May 1989
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 1989