Wong, George Kam Kwong (CPSO#: 27176)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Sydney, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7875 Riverside Drive East
Windsor ON  N8S 1E1
Phone: (519) 974-0005
Fax: (519) 974-0008
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. George K. K. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Wong ( CPSO# 27176 )

Business Address:
7875 Riverside Drive East
Windsor ON  N8S 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 739-0000

Business Address:
Suite 201
2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 977-6643

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE KAM KWONG WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jul 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2005