Wong, Helen Hoi Lam (CPSO#: 87520)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Surgical Centre
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1J 8P5
Phone: 905-721-3281
Fax: 905-721-6606
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 579-8711 Ext. 4559
Fax: 905-721-7774
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Helen H. L. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Wong ( CPSO# 87520 )

Business Address:
Taunton Surgical Centre
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1J 8P5
Phone Number: (905) 721-3281

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HELEN HOI LAM WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Aug 2007 to 03 Sep 2007
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Nov 2007 to 21 Dec 2007
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2010