Wong, Herbert Man-Yin (CPSO#: 72546)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room B627
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6780
Fax: (416) 480-5159
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Herbert Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Wong ( CPSO# 72546 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences
Room B627
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6780

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HERBERT MAN-YIN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2004