Wong, Hon Wah (CPSO#: 65277)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 123
8787 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 9S2
Phone: (905) 513-8795
Fax: (905) 513-9497
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hon Wah Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Wong ( CPSO# 65277 )

Business Address:
123 - 8787 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 9S2
Phone Number: (905) 513-8795

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HON WAH WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993