Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Wong, Ivan Fei Lit (CPSO#: 58135)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Health Centre
3003 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1M9
Phone: (416) 694-4343
Fax: (416) 694-4241
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IVAN FEI LIT WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1988