Wong, Jacinda (CPSO#: 106046)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Nov 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Health Service
300-100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: 613-564-3950
Fax: 613-564-6627
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Orleans Urgent Care Clinic
1220 Place d'Orleans Drive
Orleans ON  K1C7K3
Canada
Phone: 613-841-5389
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACINDA WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 18 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2017