Wong, Jacqueline Mei-Sann (CPSO#: 68871)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Aug 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chesley Medical Clinic
P O Box 389
33 2nd Ave SE
Chesley ON  N0G 1L0
Phone: (519) 363-3220
Fax: (519) 363-0385
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE MEI-SANN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1997