Wong, John Wang-Ngai (CPSO#: 55869)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: Wong, Wang Ngai (used until: 17 Jun 1986 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anatomic Pathology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6106
Fax: (416) 480-4271
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wong ( CPSO# 55869 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anatomic Pathology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite E4 - 11
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4013

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN WANG-NGAI WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1986