Wong, Joseph Ping Cheung (CPSO#: 69796)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Mar 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Dec 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Chinese University of Hong Kong, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11666 Laity St
Maple Ridge BC  V2X 5A3
Phone: (604) 463-1870

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH PING CHEUNG WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1997