Wong, Joseph Siu-Wah (CPSO#: 61354)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Finch University of Health Sciences, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3410 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 301
Scarborough ON  M1T 3K4
Phone: (416) 293-7333
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wong ( CPSO# 61354 )

Business Address:
3410 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 301
Scarborough ON  M1T 3K4
Phone Number: (416) 293-7333

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 15 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH SIU-WAH WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1992