Wong, Joyce (CPSO#: 63678)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Apr 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Alberta, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peter Lougheed Centre of
Calgary General Hospital
Rm 5940 East Wing, Vascular Surg.
3500 26 Avenue N E
Calgary AB  T1Y 6J4
Phone: (403) 943-5483
Fax: (403) 291-2734

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist
General Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 04 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOYCE WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 6 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1993