Wong, Karen Wing-Yin (CPSO#: 84727)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Plastic Surgery
Suite 5418
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6447
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen WY Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wong ( CPSO# 84727 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Plastic Surgery
Suite 5418
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6447

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN WING-YIN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2013