Wong, Karen (CPSO#: 78070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Womens College Hospital
Family Practice
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6060
Fax: (416) 323-6345
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wong ( CPSO# 78070 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital Family Practice
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6060

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Birth Unit
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2002