Wong, Keith Heung (CPSO#: 52048)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Oct 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Keith H. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 31 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Limited 1 High Meadow Pl North York ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1(800)-775-0093
Date Received: 10 Nov 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Oct 2016